HI SB1155 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-10 - (H) Referred to AGR/WLO, FIN, referral sheet 33
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-10 - (H) Referred to AGR/WLO, FIN, referral sheet 33
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the long-term agricultural lease task force in the department of agriculture. Makes an appropriation. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)
Title
Agricultural Leases; Task Force; Appropriation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-10 | (H) Referred to AGR/WLO, FIN, referral sheet 33 | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 261) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2011-03-08 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-03-04 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-11. | |
2011-03-04 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 777) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2011-03-01 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, English, Espero, Fukunaga, Kahele, Kim, Kouchi, Ryan, Tokuda, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz. | |
2011-02-25 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-01-11 9:20AM in conference room 211. | |
2011-02-11 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2011-02-11 | (S) Reported from AGL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 106) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2011-02-08 | (S) The committee(s) on AGL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AGL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Kahele, Dela Cruz, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Kouchi, Shimabukuro, Wakai. | |
2011-02-03 | (S) The committee(s) on AGL deferred the measure until 02-08-11 2:45PM in conference room 229. | |
2011-01-31 | (S) The committee(s) on AGL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-11 2:45PM in conference room 229. | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Referred to AGL, WAM. | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Introduced. |