HI SB1146 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous SB1146

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Bans the sale of flavored tobacco products and mislabeled e-liquid products. Effective 1/1/2022.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Tobacco Products.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-02-03SenateRe-Referred to HTH/CPN, JDC/WAM.
2021-01-29SenateReferred to HTH/CPN, JDC.
2021-01-27SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-01-27SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB992 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
SB1146 (Carry Over) 2021-02-03 - Re-Referred to HTH/CPN, JDC/WAM.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback