HI SB1145 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous SB1145

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Amends and repeals sections in chapter 338, Hawaii Revised Statutes, to allow the Department of Health to disclose vital statistics records for public health and law enforcement purposes. Updates eligibility requirements for access to confidential vital records. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The Disclosure Of Vital Statistics Records.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-02-12SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
2021-02-12SenateReported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 166) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
2021-02-03SenateThe committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Baker, Moriwaki, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-01-29SenateThe committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-21 1:05PM in conference room Videoconference.
2021-01-29SenateReferred to HTH, JDC.
2021-01-27SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-01-27SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB991 (Same As)
SB1145 (Carry Over) 2021-02-12 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback