HI SB1145 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-10 - (H) Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 33
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-10 - (H) Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 33
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the State to attain certain food sustainability standards by enumerated deadlines. Requires DOA to monitor the State's progress in achieving the food sustainability standards. Requires DOA to report to the legislature annually. Appropriates funds to DOA. Effective 07/01/2050. (SD2)
Title
Department of Agriculture; Food Sustainability Standards; Appropriation
Sponsors
Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Gilbert Kahele [D] | Sen. Ronald Kouchi [D] |
Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-10 | (H) Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 33 | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 258) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2011-03-08 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-03-04 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-11. | |
2011-03-04 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 701) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2011-03-01 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 14 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Fukunaga, Kahele, Kim, Kouchi, Ryan, Tokuda, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-02-25 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-01-11 9:20AM in conference room 211. | |
2011-02-11 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2011-02-11 | (S) Reported from AGL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 105) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2011-02-08 | (S) The committee(s) on AGL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AGL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Kahele, Dela Cruz, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Kouchi, Shimabukuro, Wakai. | |
2011-02-03 | (S) The committee(s) on AGL deferred the measure until 02-08-11 2:45PM in conference room 229. | |
2011-01-31 | (S) The committee(s) on AGL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-11 2:45PM in conference room 229. | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Referred to AGL, WAM. | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Introduced. |