HI SB1134 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1134
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-07 - Referred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-07 - Referred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes an appropriation for a Heeia State Park community-based long-range plan and planning and design of the education center for the Heeia National Estuarine Research Reserve System. Takes effect 12/31/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Heeia State Park.
Sponsors
Sen. Gil Riviere [D] | Sen. Kurt Fevella [R] | Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 372) in amended form (SD 1). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-05-19. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1169) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Taniguchi. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-15-19 10:15AM in conference room 211. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 203) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Nishihara, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-19 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to WTL, WAM. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1134 (Carry Over) 2019-03-07 - Referred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 27
HB1068 (Same As) 2019-07-03 - Act 166, 06/27/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1268).
HB1068 (Same As) 2019-07-03 - Act 166, 06/27/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1268).