HI SB1130 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1130
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes a principal of an activity desk, and all persons with an ownership interest in the activity desk, jointly and severally liable for any financial deficiency when the activity desk's client trust account is insufficient to pay consumers or activity providers. Clarifies that an activity desk, along with its principal and all persons with an ownership interest in the activity desk, shall be held liable for statutory violations and subsequent damages. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Activity Desks.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-01 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-10 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-10 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-03-09 | House | Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 17 |
2023-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2023-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 363) in amended form (SD 1). |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fukunaga). Transmitted to House. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-07-23. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 869) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2023-03-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa. |
2023-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 03-01-23 9:30AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 618) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2023-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga, McKelvey, Richards, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 02-10-23 9:40AM; CR 229 & Videoconference. |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPN, JDC. |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Referred to EET/CPN, JDC. |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1130 (Carry Over) 2023-03-09 - Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 17