HI SB1130 | 2023 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future SB1130

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-09 - Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 17
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Makes a principal of an activity desk, and all persons with an ownership interest in the activity desk, jointly and severally liable for any financial deficiency when the activity desk's client trust account is insufficient to pay consumers or activity providers. Clarifies that an activity desk, along with its principal and all persons with an ownership interest in the activity desk, shall be held liable for statutory violations and subsequent damages. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Activity Desks.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-01 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-10 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-09HouseReferred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 17
2023-03-09HousePass First Reading
2023-03-07HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 363) in amended form (SD 1).
2023-03-07SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fukunaga). Transmitted to House.
2023-03-03SenateOne Day Notice 03-07-23.
2023-03-03SenateReported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 869) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
2023-03-01SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa.
2023-02-24SenateThe committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 03-01-23 9:30AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference.
2023-02-17SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
2023-02-17SenateReported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 618) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
2023-02-10SenateThe committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga, McKelvey, Richards, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2023-02-07SenateThe committee(s) on CPN added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 02-10-23 9:40AM; CR 229 & Videoconference.
2023-02-06SenateRe-Referred to CPN, JDC.
2023-01-27SenateReferred to EET/CPN, JDC.
2023-01-23SenatePassed First Reading.
2023-01-20SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

SB1130 (Carry Over) 2023-03-09 - Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 17

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback