HI SB113 | 2023 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future SB113

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-22 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Clarifies that calculations to determine whether a non-perishable good labeled "Hawaii Made" has met the requirement that at least 51% of the wholesale value of the product is added by production within the State include operating and overhead expenses incurred and spent within the State. Appropriates funds to promote and develop the "Made in Hawaii" brand. Effective 6/30/3000. (HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The Labeling Of Products.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-28 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-22HouseThe committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
2023-03-20HouseBill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 03-22-23 2:00PM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
2023-03-17HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran excused (1).
2023-03-17HouseReported from ECD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1281) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
2023-03-15HouseThe committee on ECD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Holt, Lamosao, La Chica, Nakamura, Quinlan, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Hussey-Burdick, Kong.
2023-03-13HouseBill scheduled to be heard by ECD on Wednesday, 03-15-23 10:00AM in House conference room 423 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
2023-03-09HouseReferred to ECD, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 17
2023-03-09HousePass First Reading
2023-03-07HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 88) in amended form (SD 2).
2023-03-07SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fukunaga). Transmitted to House.
2023-03-03Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-23.
2023-03-03SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 948) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2023-02-28SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Aquino, DeCoite, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2023-02-23SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-28-23 10:00AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
2023-02-15SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2023-02-15SenateReported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 274) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2023-01-31SenateThe committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga, McKelvey, Richards, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2023-01-27SenateThe committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-23 9:05AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
2023-01-20SenateReferred to CPN, WAM.
2023-01-18SenateIntroduced and passed First Reading.
2023-01-17SenatePending Introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB113 (Carry Over) 2023-03-22 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
HB266 (Same As) 2023-02-08 - The committee(s) on ECD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback