HI SB1128 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1128
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-03 - The committee on HHS deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-03 - The committee on HHS deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts gross proceeds from medical services provided by physicians and advanced practice registered nurses acting in the capacity of a primary care provider from the general excise tax. Effective 1/1/2024.
Title
Relating To Health Care Services.
Sponsors
Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] |
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-03 | Senate | The committee on HHS deferred the measure. |
2023-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on HHS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-23 1:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Referred to HHS, WAM. |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1128 (Carry Over) 2023-02-03 - The committee on HHS deferred the measure.
HB240 (Same As) 2023-01-25 - Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 1
HB240 (Same As) 2023-01-25 - Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 1
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1128&year=2023 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2023/bills/SB1128_.HTM |