HI SB1123 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1123
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts members of a county council from the limitation on the number of members that may attend an informational meeting or presentation on matters relating to official county council business for purposes of permitted interactions. Clarifies that such meetings shall be meetings that are open to the public.
Title
Relating To Permitted Interactions.
Sponsors
Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] | Sen. Brandon Elefante [D] |
Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-02-03 | Senate | The committee on PSM deferred the measure. |
2023-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-23 3:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDC. |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1123 (Carry Over) 2023-02-03 - The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
HB563 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
HB563 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1123&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/SB1123_.HTM |