HI SB1118 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1118
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Employees' Retirement System to recover overpaid benefit payments. Requires the Employees' Retirement System to adopt rules to effectuate the maximum recovery of overpayments. Allows the Board of Trustees or the Executive Director of the Employees' Retirement System to waive the recovery of an overpayment in cases of bona fide hardship or where the costs of recovery would exceed the amount expected to be recovered. Takes effect 1/1/2051. (SD1)
Title
Relating To The Employees' Retirement System.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Reported from LCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 408) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LCA were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Ihara, S. Chang; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Fevella. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-19 2:45PM in conference room 224. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to LCA, WAM. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1118 (Carry Over) 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.