HI SB1118 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1118
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Re-Referred to PSM/AEN, JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Re-Referred to PSM/AEN, JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Removes exemptions from building codes and building permits for certain agricultural buildings and structures. Requires each county to establish a list of agricultural buildings and structures that are exempt from building permit regulations no later than January 1, 2018. Exempts specified buildings and structures, and their appurtenances, from certain building permit requirements.
Title
Relating To Agricultural Building Permits.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-17 | Senate | Re-Referred to PSM/AEN, JDC/WAM. |
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-02-08 | Senate | The committee on AEN deferred the measure. |
2017-02-08 | Senate | The committee on PSM deferred the measure. |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Re-Referred to PSM/AEN, JDL/WAM. |
2017-01-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-17 1:15PM in conference room 224. |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Referred to PSM/AEN, WAM. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1118 (Carry Over) 2017-02-08 - The committee on AEN deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1118&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/SB1118_.HTM |