HI SB1101 | 2023 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future SB1101

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-29 - The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Conforms county debt limit statements law to permit counties to exclude tax increment bonds from the debt limit of the counties if a constitutional amendment authorizing the use of tax increment bonds and excluding tax increment bonds from determinations of the Counties' funded debt is ratified. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Tax Increment Bonds.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-28 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-29HouseThe committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
2023-03-27HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-29-23 2:00PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
2023-03-09HouseReferred to FIN, referral sheet 17
2023-03-09HousePass First Reading
2023-03-07HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 357) in amended form (SD 1).
2023-03-07SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fukunaga). Transmitted to House.
2023-03-03Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-23.
2023-03-03SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 991) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2023-02-28SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Aquino, DeCoite, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2023-02-23SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-28-23 10:00AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
2023-02-10SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
2023-02-10SenateReported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 146) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
2023-02-03SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, San Buenaventura, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2023-01-30SenateThe committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-23 9:30AM; CR 016 & Videoconference.
2023-01-27SenateReferred to JDC, WAM.
2023-01-23SenatePassed First Reading.
2023-01-20SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

SB1101 (Carry Over) 2023-03-29 - The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
HB1456 (Same As) 2023-01-30 - Referred to FIN, referral sheet 3

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback