HI SB1101 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1101
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows, in cases where the Department of Education directly expends its own funds for disaster relief to be directly credited with any federal disaster relief reimbursement. Clarifies that the Department of Education may carry over funds received as disaster relief appropriation or reimbursement. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Disaster Relief.
Sponsors
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] |
Sen. Kalani English [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-16 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 317) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, K. Kahele, Espero; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Riviere. |
2017-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU deferred the measure until 02-13-17 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2017-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-17 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Re-Referred to EDU, WAM. |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Referred to EDU/PSM, WAM. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1101 (Carry Over) 2017-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
HB1231 (Same As) 2017-07-11 - Act 139, on 07/10/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1240).
HB1231 (Same As) 2017-07-11 - Act 139, on 07/10/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1240).