HI SB1100 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 788).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Enacts the National Association of Insurance Commissioners' Insurance Data Security Model Law to establish insurance data security standards for Hawaii insurance licensees. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Insurance Data Security.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-31 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-13HouseReceived notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 788).
2021-04-13SenateSenate disagrees with House amendments.
2021-04-09SenateDeferred One Day 04-13-21.
2021-04-09SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 430).
2021-04-08HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2021-04-08HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1697), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2021-03-31HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
2021-03-29HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-31-21 2:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
2021-03-25HouseReport adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2021-03-25HouseReported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1479) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
2021-03-24HouseThe committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Todd.
2021-03-24HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-24-21 2:30PM in conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
2021-03-23HouseThe committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-24-21.
2021-03-19HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 03-23-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
2021-03-19HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1).
2021-03-19HouseReported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1059) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
2021-03-16HouseThe committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Har, Hashem, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kong.
2021-03-12HouseBill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 03-16-21 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
2021-03-11HouseReferred to CPC, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 22
2021-03-11HousePass First Reading
2021-03-09HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 351) in amended form (SD 1).
2021-03-09SenatePassed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2021-03-04Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-09-21.
2021-03-04SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2021-03-04SenateReported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 614) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2021-02-17SenateThe committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Chang, Misalucha, Nishihara, Riviere, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-02-12SenateThe committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-17-21 9:30AM; 229 & Videoconference.
2021-01-29SenateReferred to CPN.
2021-01-27SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-01-27SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB946 (Same As) 2021-02-04 - Re-referred to CPC, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 6

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback