HI SB1093 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1093
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes and provides moneys for the composting grant program in the Department of Education.
Title
Relating To The Composting Grant Program.
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] |
Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Referred to EDU/AEN, WAM. |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1093 (Carry Over) 2023-01-27 - Referred to EDU/AEN, WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1093&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/SB1093_.HTM |