HI SB1092 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous SB1092

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Suspends the requirement for disposition of the conveyance tax to the land conservation fund and the rental housing revolving fund for fiscal year 2021-2022 and fiscal year 2022-2023. Effective 7/1/2050. Sunsets 6/30/2023. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The Dispositon Of Taxes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-02-23HouseReferred to WAL, HSG, FIN, referral sheet 17
2021-02-23HousePass First Reading
2021-02-22HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 45) in amended form (SD 1).
2021-02-22SenatePassed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella, Ihara, Kim . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Acasio). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2021-02-18Senate48 Hrs. Notice 02-22-21.
2021-02-18SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2021-02-18SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 394) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2021-02-10SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro.
2021-02-03SenateThe committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-21 10:00AM in conference room 211.
2021-01-29SenateReferred to WAM.
2021-01-27SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-01-27SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB938 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
SB1092 (Carry Over) 2021-02-23 - Referred to WAL, HSG, FIN, referral sheet 17

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback