HI SB1090 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous SB1090

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Changes the formula for crediting unused sick leave to retirement benefits for public employees who become members of the Employees' Retirement System after June 30, 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The Employees' Retirement System.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-01-29SenateReferred to LCA, WAM.
2021-01-27SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-01-27SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB936 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
SB1090 (Carry Over) 2021-01-29 - Referred to LCA, WAM.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback