HI SB1090 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1090
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Re-Referred to JDC, WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Re-Referred to JDC, WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases fines for ethics violations and for violations of the lobbyist law, chapter 97, HRS. Clarifies the ethics code's language regarding the assessment of fines in the context of a settlement agreement. Removes statutory remnants from when violations of chapter 97, HRS, were criminal offenses.
Title
Relating To Ethics.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-17 | Senate | Re-Referred to JDC, WAM. |
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Referred to JDL, WAM. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1090&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/SB1090_.HTM |