HI SB1086 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1086
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-23 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Choy voting no (1) and Representative(s) Aquino, Ichiyama, Souki excused (3).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-23 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Choy voting no (1) and Representative(s) Aquino, Ichiyama, Souki excused (3).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Motion Picture, Digital Media, and Film Production Income Tax Credit by providing additional tax credit options for payroll costs and 35 percent of qualified production costs for qualified productions employing local workers in a county with a population of 700,000 or less; permitting the option of offering the State an alternative marketing opportunity; adding new verification and reporting requirements; and extending the repeal of the tax credit until January 1, 2024. (SB1086 HD1)
Title
Relating To The Motion Picture, Digital Media, And Film Production Income Tax Credit.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-23 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Choy voting no (1) and Representative(s) Aquino, Ichiyama, Souki excused (3). |
2017-03-23 | House | Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1237) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2017-03-17 | House | The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Keohokalole, Holt, Johanson, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2017-03-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Friday, 03-17-17 10:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2017-03-09 | House | Referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2017-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 341) in amended form (SD 2). |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-17. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 903) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2017-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Riviere, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Taniguchi ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Inouye, Wakai. |
2017-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-27-17 9:30AM in conference room 211. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Reported from ETT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 428) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2017-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on ETT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ETT were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Taniguchi, Galuteria; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, L. Thielen. |
2017-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on ETT has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-17 1:15PM in conference room 414. |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Referred to ETT, WAM. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1086 (Carry Over) 2017-03-23 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Choy voting no (1) and Representative(s) Aquino, Ichiyama, Souki excused (3).