HI SB1074 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1074
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires check cashers to register with the department of commerce and consumer affairs. Requires check cashers to offer customers the option to participate in a payment plan, if certain conditions are met. Requires posting of certain information and written notice containing specific information to be provided to customers. Amends the limit, deposit deferral, and fees charged for deferred deposit transactions. Removes the exemption for entities engaged in the retail sale of good or services that periodically cash items for a fee. Effective 7/1/2020.
Title
Relating To Check Cashing.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to CPH. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1074 (Carry Over) 2019-01-28 - Referred to CPH.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1074&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SB1074_.HTM |