HI SB1074 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-11 - Vetoed on 07-11-17 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1273).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on July 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-11 - Vetoed on 07-11-17 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1273).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to the State Foundation on Culture and the Arts to fund celebrations for the 50th anniversary of the Hawaii state capitol. (CD1)
Title
Relating To The Fiftieth Anniversary Of The Hawaii State Capitol.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-11 | Senate | Vetoed on 07-11-17 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1273). |
2017-07-11 | House | Vetoed (Gov. Msg. No. 1273). |
2017-06-23 | Senate | Notice of Intent to veto dated 06-23-17 (Gov. Msg. No. 1161) |
2017-06-23 | House | Notice of intent to veto (Gov. Msg. No. 1161) |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 642). |
2017-05-03 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 737). |
2017-05-02 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kim . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2017-04-27 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-02-17. |
2017-04-27 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 14) as amended in (CD 1). |
2017-04-27 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 5-02-17. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 14). |
2017-04-24 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 2 Ayes: Representative(s) Ito, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Harimoto, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-24-17 1:00PM in conference room 312. |
2017-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 681). |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Taniguchi Chair; Harimoto Co-Chair; Ihara. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 587). |
2017-04-17 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Ito, Tokioka Co-Chairs; McDermott. |
2017-04-07 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 540). |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 505). |
2017-04-06 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Oshiro, Saiki, Say excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-04-06 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1663), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2017-03-31 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Tokioka, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan, Tupola. |
2017-03-30 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 03-31-17 3:15PM in conference room 308. |
2017-03-30 | House | The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-31-17. |
2017-03-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-30-17 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2017-03-22 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, C. Lee, Lowen excused (3). |
2017-03-22 | House | Reported from VMI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1204) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2017-03-16 | House | The committees on VMI recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Ito, Tokioka, Cachola, Choy, Ohno, Woodson, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Onishi. |
2017-03-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by VMI on Thursday, 03-16-17 9:30AM in House conference room 429. |
2017-03-09 | House | Referred to VMI, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2017-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 337) in amended form (SD 1). |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Espero, Kim. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-17. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 764) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2017-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye, Wakai. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-23-17 9:30AM in conference room 211. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Reported from IAA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 294) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2017-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on IAA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in IAA were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, English, S. Chang; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Shimabukuro. |
2017-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on IAA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-17 2:50PM in conference room 229. |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Referred to IAA, WAM. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1225 (Same As) 2017-02-17 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2).