HI SB1068 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB1068

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Makes an appropriation to improve na ala hele, the Hawaii statewide trail and access program, by improving access to and maintaining state controlled recreational trails statewide and promoting hiker safety and education and outreach regarding hiker etiquette, including Native Hawaiian culture, history, and traditional and customary practices connected to Hawaii's trails. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Trails.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-01 Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
2019-02-12SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2019-02-12SenateReported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 202) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2019-02-01SenateThe committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Nishihara, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran.
2019-01-29SenateThe committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-19 1:15PM in conference room 229.
2019-01-28SenateReferred to WTL, WAM.
2019-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

SB1068 (Carry Over) 2019-02-12 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback