HI SB1063 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB1063

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Technology and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires any wireless communication antennas located within conservation districts to be camouflaged to blend in with the surrounding areas.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Wireless Communication.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-01 Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
2019-02-05SenateThe committee on EET deferred the measure.
2019-02-05SenateThe committee on TEC deferred the measure.
2019-02-01SenateThe committee(s) on TEC/EET has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-19 2:45PM in conference room 414.
2019-01-30SenateRe-Referred to TEC/EET, WTL.
2019-01-28SenateReferred to EET/WTL.
2019-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

SB1063 (Carry Over) 2019-02-05 - The committee on EET deferred the measure.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback