HI SB1061 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1061
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-19 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-19 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals the Hawaii Housing Finance and Development Corporation's Downpayment Loan Assistance Program and Homebuyers' Club Program.
Title
Relating To Housing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Housing: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-19 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Reported from HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 522) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HOU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chang, Kanuha, Moriwaki, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2021-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-21 1:15PM in conference room 225. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Referred to HOU, JDC. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1061 (Carry Over) 2021-02-19 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.
HB907 (Same As) 2021-03-24 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC/WAM.
HB907 (Same As) 2021-03-24 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC/WAM.