HI SB1059 | 2024 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous SB1059

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the definition of "emergency worker" in the Penal Code to include communications dispatchers. Takes effect 1/1/2024. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Emergency Workers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2023-12-11 Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
2023-02-09SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
2023-02-09SenateReported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 134) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
2023-02-03SenateThe committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Elefante, McKelvey, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fukunaga.
2023-01-30SenateThe committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-23 3:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
2023-01-27SenateReferred to PSM, JDC.
2023-01-23SenatePassed First Reading.
2023-01-20SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB162 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
SB1059 (Carry Over) 2023-02-09 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback