HI SB1056 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1056
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Monday 03-16-20 2:00PM in conference room 325.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Monday 03-16-20 2:00PM in conference room 325.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires lobbyists and specified individuals to file two additional reports in general election years to the Hawaii State Ethics Commission, including one report on the second Friday in August and one report on the first Monday in November. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Lobbyists.
Sponsors
Sen. Laura Thielen [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] |
Sen. Sharon Moriwaki [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Monday 03-16-20 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2020-03-12 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 03-16-20 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2020-03-12 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until Monday, 03-16-20 at 2:00 PM. |
2020-03-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 03-12-20 2:31PM in House conference room 325. |
2020-03-09 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 36 |
2020-03-05 | House | Pass First Reading |
2020-03-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 75) in amended form (SD 1). |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-03-20. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3088) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, J.Keohokalole, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Fevella. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-20-20 9:15AM in conference room 016. |
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to JDC. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1056 (Carry Over) 2019-01-28 - Referred to JDC.