HI SB1055 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous SB1055

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the environmental impact statement law to delete reference to discretionary permits in allowing infrastructure improvements within a highway or public right-of-way to be exempt from environmental assessment requirements. Takes effect 7/1/2050. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Environmental Impact Statements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 2 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-02-12SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
2021-02-12SenateReported from AEN/TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 237) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
2021-02-10SenateThe committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRS were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Fevella; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye, English.
2021-02-10SenateThe committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Rhoads ; 2 No(es): Senator(s) Acasio, Fevella; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-01-29SenateReferred to AEN/TRS, JDC.
2021-01-27SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-01-27SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB901 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
SB1055 (Carry Over) 2021-02-12 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback