HI SB1053 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1053
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a general excise tax exemption for the gross proceeds or income from the sale of groceries that are eligible under the Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program, regardless of the means of purchase and the SNAP eligibility of the purchaser, and prescription drugs.
Title
Relating To General Excise Tax Exemptions.
Sponsors
Sen. Laura Thielen [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] | Sen. Jarrett Keohokalole [D] |
Sen. Sharon Moriwaki [D] | Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-02-11 | Senate | The committee on WAM deferred the measure. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-19 10:00AM in conference room 211. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1053 (Carry Over) 2019-02-11 - The committee on WAM deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1053&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SB1053_.HTM |