HI SB1052 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB1052

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Converts the earned income tax credit from a nonrefundable to a refundable tax credit.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Taxation.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-01 Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
2019-02-11SenateThe committee on WAM deferred the measure.
2019-02-05SenateThe committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-19 10:00AM in conference room 211.
2019-01-28SenateReferred to WAM.
2019-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

SB1052 (Carry Over) 2019-02-11 - The committee on WAM deferred the measure.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback