HI SB1048 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1048
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-27 - Act 019, 04/27/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1119).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-27 - Act 019, 04/27/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1119).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides authority for the Hawaii criminal justice data center to set and collect fees for services provided. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Hawaii Criminal Justice Data Center Fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-04 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-18 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, Unamended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-28 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-18 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, Unamended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-28 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-27 | Senate | Act 019, 04/27/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1119). |
2022-04-27 | House | Act 019, on 04/27/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1119). |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 516). |
2022-04-08 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Quinlan excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-04-08 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1861-22), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2022-04-04 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Todd, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Branco, McDermott. |
2022-03-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 04-04-22 2:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-23 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kitagawa, Kong excused (2). |
2022-03-23 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1267-22), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2022-03-17 | House | The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, LoPresti, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi, Lowen, Tokioka. |
2022-03-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Thursday, 03-17-22 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-10 | House | Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 24 |
2022-03-04 | House | Pass First Reading |
2022-03-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 47) in amended form (SD 1). |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2750) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Misalucha, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai. |
2022-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-18-22 10:00AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2091) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2022-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Lee. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 01-28-22 9:30AM; Via Videoconference. |
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Re-Referred to JDC, WAM. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Referred to JDC. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB894 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
SB1048 (Carry Over) 2021-02-03 - Re-Referred to JDC, WAM.
SB1048 (Carry Over) 2021-02-03 - Re-Referred to JDC, WAM.