HI SB1040 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires Hawaii fresh produce or items made with Hawaii grown produce sold at farmers' markets to be displayed with a label or sign containing an identity statement declaring the Hawaii produce's county of geographic origin. Requires non-Hawaii produce sold at farmers' markets to be displayed with a label or sign containing an identity statement declaring the produce "imported". Effective 07/01/2050. (SD2)
Title
Department of Agriculture; Labeling; Farmers' Markets; Fresh Produce; Hawaii Produce; Imported Produce; Geographical Origin
Sponsors
Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Gilbert Kahele [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-03-19 | House | The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2015-03-16 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Thursday, 03-19-15 8:30AM in House conference room 312. |
2015-03-12 | House | Referred to AGR, CPC, referral sheet 30 |
2015-03-12 | House | Pass First Reading |
2015-03-10 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 268) in amended form (SD 2). |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Nishihara . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-10-15. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 585) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2015-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Taniguchi, Kahele, Kidani, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai, Slom. |
2015-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 02-24-15 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN. |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Reported from AGL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 127) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN. |
2015-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on AGL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AGL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ruderman, Riviere, Chun Oakland, L. Thielen, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Slom. |
2015-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on AGL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-15 2:45PM in conference room 414. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to AGL, CPN. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Introduced. |