HI SB1037 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-09 - Referred to JUD, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires that certain agencies be notified when a firearm permit application is denied because the applicant is prohibited from owning, possessing, receiving, or controlling a firearm under federal or state law. Requires the firearms permit issuing authority to notify the court that issued a protective or restraining order on an applicant, as applicable, upon notification of a permit denial. Requires the department of public safety to notify the probation or parole officer of an applicant, if applicable, upon notification of a permit denial. Takes effect 5/22/2050. (SD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Firearms.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-09HouseReferred to JUD, referral sheet 27
2017-03-09HousePass First Reading
2017-03-07HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 329) in amended form (SD 2).
2017-03-07SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2017-03-03Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-17.
2017-03-03SenateReported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 842) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2017-03-01SenateThe committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Gabbard.
2017-02-23SenateThe committee(s) on JDL will hold a public decision making on 03-01-17 9:15AM in conference room 016.
2017-02-17SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL.
2017-02-17SenateReported from PSM/GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 445) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL.
2017-02-14SenateThe committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Ruderman, K. Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Tokuda.
2017-02-14SenateThe committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Baker, Ihara, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2017-02-10SenateThe committee(s) on PSM/GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-14-17 1:45PM in conference room 229.
2017-01-25SenateReferred to PSM/GVO, JDL.
2017-01-25SenatePassed First Reading.
2017-01-25SenateIntroduced.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback