HI SB1036 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1036
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires purchasing agencies to make a written determination that the amount of a contracting action for purchases of health and human services is fair and reasonable. Amends the selection process and composition of the procurement policy board. Amends the circumstances for when treatment services may be purchased and the procedure to purchase such services. Increases the small purchase threshold. Repeals the establishment of the community council on purchase of health and human services. Establishes the state payor committee within the department of health to implement a unified framework for tracking, coordinating, and guiding the purchase of behavioral health, substance abuse, and homelessness services. Requires nongovernmental entities that contract for services relating to behavioral health, substance abuse, or homelessness services to disclose any sources of funding to perform such services. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Procurement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-17 - House - House Government Reform: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-03-19 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1). |
2021-03-19 | House | Reported from GVR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1082) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2021-03-17 | House | The committees on GVR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Wildberger, Cullen, Mizuno, Woodson, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ward; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, Ichiyama. |
2021-03-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by GVR on Wednesday, 03-17-21 10:00AM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-11 | House | Referred to GVR, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 22 |
2021-03-11 | House | Pass First Reading |
2021-03-09 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 328) in amended form (SD 2). |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-09-21. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Reported from JDC/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 849) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2021-03-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai. |
2021-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC/WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-03-21 9:45AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM. |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Reported from HTH/HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 221) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Re-Referred to HTH/HMS, JDC/WAM. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Baker, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Moriwaki. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Ihara, Misalucha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH/HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-21 3:05PM in conference room 225. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Referred to HTH/HMS, JDC. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB882 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
SB1036 (Carry Over) 2021-03-19 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1).
SB1036 (Carry Over) 2021-03-19 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1).
Subjects
Behavioral Health Services
Community Council
Procurement
Procurement Policy Board
Purchase of Health and Human Services
State Payor Committee
Community Council
Procurement
Procurement Policy Board
Purchase of Health and Human Services
State Payor Committee