HI SB1033 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Act 032, 04/30/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1133).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes licensure of midwives. Temporarily exempts birth attendants and exempts Native Hawaiian healers from licensure requirements. Establishes task force. Appropriates funds. (SB1033 HD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The Licensure Of Midwives.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-01SenateAct 032, 04/30/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1133).
2019-05-01HouseAct 032, on 04/30/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1133).
2019-04-12SenateEnrolled to Governor.
2019-04-12HouseReceived notice of Senate agreement and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 896).
2019-04-12SenatePassed Final Reading. Ayes, 19; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) K. Kahele, Ruderman . 2 No(es): Senator(s) Gabbard, Shimabukuro. 4 Excused: Senator(s) S. Chang, Harimoto, Ihara, L. Thielen.
2019-04-11SenateSenate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Reading on 04-12-19.
2019-04-11SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 766).
2019-04-09HousePassed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Cachola, DeCoite, Har, D. Kobayashi, Kong, Okimoto, Perruso, Quinlan, Say, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Gates, McDermott, Ward, Wildberger voting no (4) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-04-05HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-09-19.
2019-04-05HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2213) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-04-03HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; 3 Noes: Representative(s) Gates, Wildberger, McDermott; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Holt, Nishimoto.
2019-04-01HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 04-03-19 2:30PM in conference room 308.
2019-03-29HouseThe committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 04-03-19.
2019-03-27HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 03-29-19 3:30PM in House conference room 308.
2019-03-22HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) DeCoite, Har, B. Kobayashi, D. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Perruso, San Buenaventura, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Okimoto, Ward, Wildberger voting no (4) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2).
2019-03-22HouseReported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1700) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2019-03-21HouseThe committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Nakamura, San Buenaventura; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Say; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Ward; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Tokioka.
2019-03-19HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 03-21-19 10:05AM in conference room 329.
2019-03-19HouseThe committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-21-19 at 10:05AM.
2019-03-15HouseProposed draft of Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Tuesday, 03-19-19 8:30AM in House conference room 329.
2019-03-11HouseRe-referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 29
2019-03-07HouseReferred to HLT/WLH, IAC/CPC, FIN, referral sheet 27
2019-03-07HousePass First Reading
2019-03-05HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 344) in amended form (SD 2).
2019-03-05SenateReport Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Moriwaki, Ruderman, Shimabukuro. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Gabbard). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
2019-03-01Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19.
2019-03-01SenateReported from JDC/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1035) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2019-02-26SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, English, Kanuha, Kidani, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Harimoto, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Inouye, K. Kahele, Riviere.
2019-02-26SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Gabbard ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-02-21SenateThe committee(s) on JDC/WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-26-19 10:00AM in conference room 211.
2019-02-15SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
2019-02-15SenateReported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 659) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM.
2019-02-13SenateThe committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Nishihara, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) J.Keohokalole.
2019-02-12SenateThe committee(s) on CPH deferred the measure until 02-13-19 10:00AM in conference room 229.
2019-02-08SenateThe committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-19 9:00AM in conference room 229.
2019-01-24SenateReferred to CPH, JDC/WAM.
2019-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB490 (Same As) 2019-02-15 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Cachola, McKelvey, Perruso, San Buenaventura, Wildberger voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Tokioka, Ward voting no (3) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback