HI SB1030 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1030
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the executive office on aging to coordinate with the University of Hawaii center on aging to implement an active aging initiative. Establishes an active aging advisory committee. Appropriates funds.
Title
Relating To Active Aging.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPH/HRE, WAM. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to CPH/HMS/HRE, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB472 (Same As) 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
SB1030 (Carry Over) 2019-01-30 - Re-Referred to CPH/HRE, WAM.
SB1030 (Carry Over) 2019-01-30 - Re-Referred to CPH/HRE, WAM.
Subjects
Active Aging Initiative
Appropriation ($)
Executive Office on Aging
Health
Kupuna Caucus
Older Adults
University of Hawaii Center on Aging
Appropriation ($)
Executive Office on Aging
Health
Kupuna Caucus
Older Adults
University of Hawaii Center on Aging
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1030&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SB1030_.HTM |