HI SB1029 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1029
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-07 - Referred to HSH, JUD, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Human Services & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-07 - Referred to HSH, JUD, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Human Services & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the policy advisory board for elder affairs to establish quorum requirements through its bylaws and post its bylaws on the executive office on aging's website. Specifies that a majority of currently serving members, but no fewer than eight, shall constitute quorum. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Aging.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to HSH, JUD, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 342) in amended form (SD 1). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Reported from CPH/HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 826) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ruderman, K. Rhoads, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) S. Chang, J.Keohokalole, Nishihara. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH/HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-20-19 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to CPH/HMS. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1029 (Carry Over) 2019-03-07 - Referred to HSH, JUD, referral sheet 27
HB471 (Same As) 2019-06-28 - Act 125, 06/25/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1227).
HB471 (Same As) 2019-06-28 - Act 125, 06/25/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1227).