HI SB1028 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-24 - Referred to LCA, WAM.
Pending: Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the legislative reference bureau to conduct a feasibility study to determine the feasibility of establishing a Hawaii retirement savings program. Subject to a positive finding in the feasibility study, establishes the Hawaii retirement savings board to establish, implement, and maintain the Hawaii retirement savings program to cover private sector employees who are not provided a retirement savings plan by their employers. Appropriates funds to the legislative reference bureau to conduct a market analysis. Prohibits employers that offer retirement savings plans or programs to employees from canceling these plans or programs for an unspecified number of years after July 1, 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Retirement Savings.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-24SenateReferred to LCA, WAM.
2019-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB470 (Same As) 2019-01-22 - Referred to HSH/LAB, IAC/CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback