HI SB1027 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB1027

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires health insurance policies and contracts issued after 12/31/19 to provide coverage for the cost of hearing aids at a minimum of $1,500 per hearing aid for each hearing-impaired ear every 36 months. Exempts mandatory health care coverage from impact assessment report. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Hearing Aids.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-01 Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
2019-03-07HouseReferred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 27
2019-03-07HousePass First Reading
2019-03-05HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 341) in amended form (SD 2).
2019-03-05SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
2019-03-01Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19.
2019-03-01SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 952) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2019-02-21SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Riviere.
2019-02-19SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-21-19 10:00AM in conference room 211.
2019-02-12SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2019-02-12SenateReported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 185) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2019-02-05SenateThe committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, J.Keohokalole, Nishihara, Ruderman, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
2019-02-01SenateThe committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-19 9:00AM in conference room 229.
2019-01-30SenateRe-Referred to CPH, WAM.
2019-01-24SenateReferred to CPH/HMS, WAM.
2019-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB469 (Same As) 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
SB1027 (Carry Over) 2019-03-07 - Referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 27

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback