HI SB1026 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous SB1026

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Adds new sources of revenue generated by the State Veterinary Laboratory and Animal Disease Control Branch that shall be deposited into the animal industry special fund. (SD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The Animal Industry Special Fund.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-19 - House - House Agriculture: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-03-23HousePassed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
2021-03-23HouseReported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1215), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2021-03-19HouseThe committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashem, Perruso, Lowen, Marten, Matayoshi, Tokioka, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Todd.
2021-03-16HouseBill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Friday, 03-19-21 10:00AM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
2021-03-11HouseReferred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 22
2021-03-11HousePass First Reading
2021-03-09HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 323) in amended form (SD 2).
2021-03-09SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2021-03-05Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-09-21.
2021-03-05SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 778) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2021-02-26SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro.
2021-02-24SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-26-21 9:30AM; CR 211 & Videoconference.
2021-02-19SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2021-02-19SenateReported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 465) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2021-02-17SenateThe committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Acasio, Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-02-04SenateThe committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-17-21 1:00PM in conference room Videoconference.
2021-01-29SenateReferred to AEN, WAM.
2021-01-27SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-01-27SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB872 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
SB1026 (Carry Over) 2021-03-23 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback