HI SB1025 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1025
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Transportation and Culture and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Transportation and Culture and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the safe routes to school advisory committee within the Planning Branch of the Highways Division of the Department of Transportation. Appropriates moneys.
Title
Relating To Safe Routes To School.
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Lee [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Referred to TCA, WAM. |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1025&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/SB1025_.HTM |