HI SB1025 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Act 126, 06/25/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1228).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the Executive Office on Aging (EOA) to develop and implement a plan to maximize the number of Kupuna Caregivers Program (Program) participants and submit a copy of the Program plan to the 2020 Legislature. Authorizes EOA to adopt administrative rules to implement and administer the Program. Changes the Program funding allocation cap. Includes coordination or case management under the scope of services qualified caregivers can receive program funding for. Appropriates funds. (SB1025 HD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The Kupuna Caregivers Program.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-28SenateAct 126, 06/25/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1228).
2019-06-28HouseAct 126, on 06/25/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1228).
2019-04-16SenateEnrolled to Governor.
2019-04-16HouseReceived notice of reconsideration, Senate agreement, and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 904).
2019-04-16SenatePassed Final Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 1 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto.
2019-04-15SenateOne Day Notice 04-16-19.
2019-04-15SenateSenate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Reading on 04-16-19.
2019-04-15SenateReconsideration of action taken on 04-11-19 in disagreeing to the House amendments.
2019-04-11HouseReceived notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 893).
2019-04-11SenateSenate disagrees with House amendments.
2019-04-11SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 765).
2019-04-09HousePassed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-04-05HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-09-19.
2019-04-05HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2188) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-04-03HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Holt, Nishimoto.
2019-04-01HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 04-03-19 2:30PM in conference room 308.
2019-04-01HouseThe committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 04-03-19.
2019-03-29HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 04-01-19 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
2019-03-22HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2).
2019-03-22HouseReported from HSH/HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1646) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2019-03-20HouseThe committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Nakamura, San Buenaventura, Say, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti.
2019-03-20HouseThe committees on HSH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Nakamura, B. Kobayashi, Mizuno, Say, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti.
2019-03-15HouseBill scheduled to be heard by HSH/HLT on Wednesday, 03-20-19 10:00AM in House conference room 329.
2019-03-07HouseReferred to HSH/HLT, FIN, referral sheet 27
2019-03-07HousePass First Reading
2019-03-05HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 339) in amended form (SD 1).
2019-03-05SenateReport Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
2019-03-01Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19.
2019-03-01SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1091) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2019-02-25SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Inouye, Kidani.
2019-02-22SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-25-19 10:25AM in conference room 211.
2019-02-08SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
2019-02-08SenateReported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 110) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
2019-02-01SenateThe committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, J.Keohokalole, Nishihara, Ruderman, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) L. Thielen.
2019-01-28SenateThe committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-19 9:30AM in conference room 229.
2019-01-28SenateRe-Referred to CPH, WAM.
2019-01-24SenateReferred to CPH/HMS, WAM.
2019-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB467 (Same As) 2019-04-18 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 917).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback