HI SB1021 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1021
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Accounting and General Services to establish and operate two child care centers on Oahu for eligible children of state employees, one in or near the state capitol and one in Kapolei. Appropriates funds.
Title
Relating To Child Care.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to GVO/LCA, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB416 (Same As) 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
SB1021 (Carry Over) 2019-01-24 - Referred to GVO/LCA, WAM.
SB1021 (Carry Over) 2019-01-24 - Referred to GVO/LCA, WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1021&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SB1021_.HTM |