HI SB1009 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-16 - The committee on GVO deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the definition of "personal information" for the purpose of applying modern security breach of personal information law. Prohibits the sale of geolocation information and internet browser information without consent. Amends provisions relating to electronic eavesdropping law. Prohibits certain manipulated images of individuals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Privacy.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-16SenateThe committee on GVO deferred the measure.
2021-02-12SenateThe committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-16-21 3:05PM; CR 016 & Videoconference.
2021-01-29SenateReferred to GVO, JDC.
2021-01-27SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-01-27SenateIntroduced.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback