HI SB1000 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous SB1000

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the designation of areas or regions of public lands classified as commercial, industrial, resort and hotel, and the establishment and implementation of guidelines for the redevelopment of the areas or regions that will: (1) modernize the policies for the management of public lands in the designated area; (2) establish a plan for the designated area, including district-wide improvements, that is coordinated with state and county land use and planning policies; and (3) implement asset and property management concepts that can optimize income from the properties and evolve in response to changing principles of property administration. Designates the public lands on the Waiakea peninsula on the island of Hawaii as the Waiakea peninsula redevelopment district. Allows the department of land and natural resources to issue a rent reduction or waiver for certain lessee's expenses for demolition or provision of basic infrastructure. Authorizes a local redevelopment agency to contract with a developer for construction of non-residential projects on public land within a redevelopment area. Exempts the costs of construction of work or improvements of a redevelopment project from general excise and use taxes. Makes an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Public Lands.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-02-10SenateThe committee on WTL deferred the measure.
2021-02-08SenateThe committee(s) on WTL deferred the measure until 02-10-21 1:00PM in conference room 229.
2021-02-05SenateThe committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-21 1:00PM in conference room 229.
2021-01-29SenateReferred to WTL, WAM/JDC.
2021-01-27SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-01-27SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB467 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
SB1000 (Carry Over) 2021-02-10 - The committee on WTL deferred the measure.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback