HI SB100 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the number of days a county legislative body has to approve, approve with modifications, or disapprove an affordable housing project. (SD1)
Title
HSAC Package; Affordable Housing; Legislative Approval
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-02-18 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to TIA. | |
2009-02-18 | (S) Reported from EDH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 111) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to TIA. | |
2009-02-09 | (S) The committee(s) on EDH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Sakamoto, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Galuteria, Tsutsui, Hemmings; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2009-02-04 | (S) The committee(s) on EDH deferred the measure until 02-09-09 1:15 PM in conference room 225. | |
2009-01-30 | (S) The committee(s) on EDH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-09 1:15pm in conference room 225. | |
2009-01-26 | (S) Referred to EDH, TIA. | |
2009-01-23 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-01-23 | (S) Introduced. |