HI SB10 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB10
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires counties to adopt rules allowing religious and educational institutions to build housing units on land they own regardless of current zoning restrictions if housing is either for Hawaii residents who are owner or renter occupants and own no other real property or affordable housing. (SD1)
Title
Related To Affordable Housing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Reported from HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 546) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chang, Kanuha, Moriwaki, Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-21 1:00PM in conference room 225. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Re-Referred to HOU, JDC. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Referred to PSM/HOU, JDC. |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB10 (Carry Over) 2021-02-19 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.