HI HR98 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HR98
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-02 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-02 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designating Kailua, Oahu, As A Vision Zero Community Where No Loss Of Life Or Serious Injury On Roads Is Acceptable And Urging Government To Adopt And Implement Vision Zero Policies And Planning.
Title
Designating Kailua, Oahu, As A Vision Zero Community Where No Loss Of Life Or Serious Injury On Roads Is Acceptable And Urging Government To Adopt And Implement Vision Zero Policies And Planning.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-02 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2019-04-02 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Saiki, Todd, Yamane excused (4). |
2019-04-02 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1942), recommending adoption. |
2019-03-22 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Lowen, McKelvey, Morikawa, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan, Say, Yamane. |
2019-03-20 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 03-22-19 2:10PM in conference room 325. |
2019-03-14 | House | Referred to JUD, referral sheet 33 |
2019-03-08 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR98 (Carry Over) 2019-04-02 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HCR104 (Same As) 2019-04-03 - Referred to TRS/PSM.
HCR104 (Same As) 2019-04-03 - Referred to TRS/PSM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=98&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HR98_.HTM |