HI HR97 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HR97

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 40
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting That The City And County Of Honolulu Prohibit Electric Scooters, Electric Bicycles, And Electric Trikes On Sidewalks.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requesting That The City And County Of Honolulu Prohibit Electric Scooters, Electric Bicycles, And Electric Trikes On Sidewalks.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-11HouseReferred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 40
2020-03-06HouseOffered
2020-03-05HouseTo be offered.

Same As/Similar To

HCR116 (Same As) 2020-03-11 - Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 40
HR97 (Carry Over) 2019-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback