HI HR97 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HR97
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The President Of The United States And The United States Congress To Grant Full Veterans Benefits To Filipino Veterans Who Fought In World War Ii But Were Subsequently Denied The Benefits To Which They Were Entitled.
Title
Urging The President Of The United States And The United States Congress To Grant Full Veterans Benefits To Filipino Veterans Who Fought In World War Ii But Were Subsequently Denied The Benefits To Which They Were Entitled.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-04 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2018-04-04 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Choy, Fukumoto, Holt, C. Lee, McKelvey excused (5). |
2018-04-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1774-18), recommending adoption. |
2018-04-03 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Fukumoto, Tupola, Ward. |
2018-03-29 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-03-18 10:05AM in conference room 308. |
2018-03-28 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1). |
2018-03-28 | House | Reported from VMI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1684-18), recommending referral to FIN. |
2018-03-23 | House | The committees on VMI recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) LoPresti, Fukumoto, Cachola, Ohno, Onishi, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Choy, Ito, Tokioka, Ward. |
2018-03-22 | House | Resolution re-scheduled to be heard by VMI on Friday, 03-23-18 10:15AM in conference room 429. |
2018-03-20 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by VMI on Friday, 03-23-18 10:00AM in conference room 429. |
2018-03-13 | House | Referred to VMI, FIN, referral sheet 39 |
2018-03-09 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HCR109 (Same As) 2018-04-18 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HR97 (Carry Over) 2017-03-14 - Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 30
HR97 (Carry Over) 2017-03-14 - Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 30
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=97&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HR97_.HTM |